CA SB500 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17952.7 and 18501.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 13006 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income taxes: nonresident de minimis income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)) |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | July 13 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1204.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1155.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 13006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 13020.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 17952.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 18501.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |