CA SB500 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7857, 8030, 8032.5, 8033, 8041, 8043, 8043.2, 8046, 8046.1, 8047, 8276.1, 8280.3, 8285, 8405.2, 9055, 15101, 15103, and 15104 of, to add Sections 9054.5 and 9056 to, and to repeal Section 8045 of, the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Section 79132 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Fish and wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB500 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 500 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Addis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 500 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Addis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2819.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3459.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1173.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 899.) (April 25). |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |