CA SB507 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41964 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Gasoline: vapor recovery systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Cox [R] | Asm. Martin Garrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-20 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-20 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 992.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-05-13 | Set for hearing May 20. | |
2009-04-21 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on EQ. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |