CA SB52 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 423, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 423, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 339 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State Route 39.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB52 Newman Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 52 Newman Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB52 Newman (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 52 Newman Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB52 Newman (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 423, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2837.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2799.) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2660.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3048.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | July 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Hernandez. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1177.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 443.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 339 | Amended Code | Citation Text |