CA SB521 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 22944.4 to the Government Code, relating to public employees' benefits, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public employees' benefits: postemployment health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Asm. Allan Mansoor [R] |
Sen. Sharon Runner [R] | Asm. Jim Silva [R] | Sen. Mimi Walters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 22000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |