CA SB521 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 615, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 615, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11320.3, 11320.31, 11331.5, and 11332.7 of, and to repeal and add Section 11333.7 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: pregnancy or parenting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB521 Smallwood-Cuevas et Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 521 Smallwood-Cuevas Senate Third Reading By Jackson (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB521 Smallwood-Cuevas et (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 521 Smallwood-Cuevas Senate Third Reading By Jackson (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB521 Smallwood-Cuevas et (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 615, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2677.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3162.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1301.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1174.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 893.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11320.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11320.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11331.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11332.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11333.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |