CA SB550 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21800, 21804, 21805, and 21806 of, to add Section 21807 to, and to repeal and add Sections 21801, 21802, and 21803 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Business: manufactured optical discs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB550 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 550 Padilla Senate Third Reading By FUENTES (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB550 Padilla (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 550 Padilla Senate Third Reading By FUENTES (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB550 Padilla (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2236.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-30 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 2692.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-23 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 17). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and PUB. S. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1186.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 862.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21807 | New Code | See Bill Text |