CA SB550 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Net energy metering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 795.) (April 27). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |