CA SB550 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 851 and 854 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: merger, acquisition, or control of electrical or gas corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB550 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 550 Hill Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB550 Hill (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 550 Hill Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB550 Hill (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2929.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2908.) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Set for hearing September 12. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2822.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3256.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1189.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1102.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 842.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 854 | Amended Code | Citation Text |