CA SB575 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 544, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 544, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10235.36 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent #9 SB575 Liu (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 575 Liu Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB575 Liu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 575 Liu Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB575 Liu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 544, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2625.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 882.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 22). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10235.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |