CA SB591 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11010.05 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 51.3.5 to the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Senior citizens: intergenerational housing developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB591 Becker et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 591 Becker Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB591 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 591 Becker Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB591 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2213.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2472.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 987.) (April 29). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | April 13 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD., HOUSING, and HUMAN S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11010.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 51.3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |