CA SB600 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Title
Sponsors
Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Jenny Oropeza [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Gloria Romero [D] |
Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 2079.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-08-27 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-08-26 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 1954.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-25 | Set for hearing August 27 in APPR pending receipt. | |
2009-08-24 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1906.) | |
2009-07-09 | Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2009-06-25 | Set for hearing July 8. | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1362.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-06-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-06-05 | Set for hearing June 17. | |
2009-06-01 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-27 | Set for hearing June 10. | |
2009-04-16 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-24 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-19 | To Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |