CA SB606 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6317, 6323, 6324, 6429, and 6602 of, and to add Sections 6317.8 and 6317.9 to, the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety.
Title
Workplace safety: violations of statutes: enterprise-wide violations: egregious violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB606 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 606 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB606 Gonzalez et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - [04-07-2021] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 606 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB606 Gonzalez et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - [04-07-2021] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2592.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 2918.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1377.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1198.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 687.) (April 6). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6317.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 6317.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 6323 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6429 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |