CA SB609 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 521, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 521, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9714, 9714.5, and 9732 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Office of the State Long-Term Care Ombudsman.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB609 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Assembly - SB 609 Wolk Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB609 Wolk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Assembly - SB 609 Wolk Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB609 Wolk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 521, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2136.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2845.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 713.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 22). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 486.) (April 9). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9714.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9732 | Amended Code | Citation Text |