CA SB609 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6980.17, 6981, 7502.6, 7504.7, 7506.10, 7511.5, 7523, 7523.5, 7528, 7532, 7541.2, 7542.2, 7564, 7570, 7573.5, 7576, 7583.2, 7583.6, 7583.8, 7583.9, 7583.10, 7583.12, 7583.15, 7583.16, 7583.19, 7583.20, 7583.23, 7585.8, 7587.8, 7587.15, 7588.6, 7588.8, 7590.5, 7591.9, 7596.3, 7596.7, 7596.81, and 7599.80 of, and to repeal and add Section 7571 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB609 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 609 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB609 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 609 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB609 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2929.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2908.) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Set for hearing September 12. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 3324.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1105.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 22). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |