CA SB626 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10187.5 and 10190 of, and to add and repeal Article 1.1 (commencing with Section 10112) and Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 10200) of Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, and to add and repeal Sections 147.1 and 148 of the Water Code, relating to water resources.
Title
Department of Water Resources: Procurement Methods.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB626 Dodd Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 626 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB626 Dodd (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 626 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB626 Dodd (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2281.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 2567.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 14). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1392.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 939.) (April 27). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10112 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10187.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10200 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 147.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 148 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |