CA SB633 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 70032 and 70036 of, and to add Section 70035.5 to, the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
California DREAM Loan Program: DREAM grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. David Alvarez [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Juan Carrillo [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 633 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB633 Gonzalez (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB633 Gonzalez (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3012.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1076.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 682.) (April 12). |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70035.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 70036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |