CA SB635 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1341.45 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care: workforce training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB635 Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB635 Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-05 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1120.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 452.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1341.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |