CA SB639 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 856, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 856, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 654.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Medical services: credit or loan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB639 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 639 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB639 Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 639 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB639 Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 856, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2883.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 3346.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1151.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | April 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 654.) (April 9). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 511.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 654.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |