CA SB643 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.4 (commencing with Section 32256) to Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety: Safe-To-Tell Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB643 Wilk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1178.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 682.) (April 12). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB S. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32256 | New Code | See Bill Text |