CA SB652 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 801.1 to the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Evidence: expert testimony.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent SB652 Umberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - SB 652 Umberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB652 Umberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - SB 652 Umberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB652 Umberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2266.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1021.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 687.) (April 11). |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB S. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 801.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |