CA SB659 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21083.2.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: archaeological resources: qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 789.) (May 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21083.2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5020.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |