CA SB659 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.7 (commencing with Section 11337) of Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Opportunity Grant Pilot Project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | January 14 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | April 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11337 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |