CA SB673 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8594.14 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency notification: Ebony Alert: missing Black youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB673 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 673 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB673 Bradford et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 673 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB673 Bradford et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2848.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3464.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1247.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 803.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8594.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |