CA SB687 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39735 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add and repeal Section 25327 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Renewable gas standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 859.) (April 29). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 509.) (April 7). |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39735 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25327 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |