CA SB692 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6588, 53313, 53316.2, 53317, 53328.1, 53340, 53350, and 53363.9 of, and to add Section 53357.1 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: community facilities districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB692 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 692 Hancock Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB692 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 692 Hancock Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB692 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1949.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 2593.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2508.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 713.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 566.) (April 17). |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53316.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53328.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53357.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53363.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6588 | Amended Code | Citation Text |