CA SB704 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30006.5, 30260, 30262, 30263, and 30701 of the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
Coastal resources: California Coastal Act of 1976: industrial developments: oil and gas developments: refineries: petrochemical facilities: offshore wind.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB704 Min Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB704 Min Concurrence Motion To Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB704 Min Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 704 Min Senate Third Reading By Pellerin (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB704 Min (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB704 Min Concurrence Motion To Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB704 Min Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 704 Min Senate Third Reading By Pellerin (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB704 Min (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2692.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2691.) |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Min. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2616.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 3140.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (August 23). |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1348.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 899.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 30006.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30262 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30263 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |