CA SB719 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 21 (commencing with Section 99600) to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State agency Internet Web sites: information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 478.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-19 | To Coms. on G.O. and RLS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |