CA SB719 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 999.7 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs: California Disabled
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB719 Correa (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB719 Correa (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1107.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |