CA SB745 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48306 of, and to add Section 48313.5 to, the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: school attendance: school districts of choice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB745 Hernandez (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - SB 745 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By HERNANDEZ (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB745 Hernandez (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - SB 745 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By HERNANDEZ (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB745 Hernandez (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained. | |
2011-09-06 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2011-09-06 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-08-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1999.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-11 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-07-11 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 2253.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-05 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 949.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-27 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2011-04-13 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-04-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48313.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |