CA SB745 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 281 and 914.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Telecommunications: universal service: California
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB745 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 745 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GIPSON (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 745 Hueso Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB745 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 745 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GIPSON (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 745 Hueso Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB745 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6080.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5957.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 29). |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2943.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2916.) (January 19). |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 19. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 914.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |