CA SB747 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21689 to the Public Utilities Code, and to add Section 7102.1 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to airports, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Airports: financial assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 21615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21682 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21682.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21682.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21683.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21683.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21689 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7102.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |