CA SB77 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 680 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 6254, 26605.6, 26605.7, and 26605.8 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1180.6, 1250.2, 1254, 1254.1, 1266.1, 1275.1, 1275.5, 1324.9, 1373, 111792, 123870, 123929, 123940, and 123955 of, and to add Section 104151 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 10125, 10127, 12693.70, 12698, 12737, and 12739.61 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Sections 359, 708, 4005.7, 4080, 5150, 5151, 5157, 5202, 5326.9, 5358, 5366.1, 5404, 5405, 5585.21, 5585.50, 5585.55, 5675, 5675.1, 5675.2, 5751.7, 5768, 5840, 5845, 5846, 5909, 6007, 6551, 7100, 14105.22, 14105.3, 14131.10, 14134, 14707.5, and 15911 of, to add Sections 14100.3, 14100.51, 14100.52, 14132.86, and 14132.89 to, to add Part 3.3 (commencing with Section 15800) to Division 9 of, to add and repeal Section 14005.281 of, and to repeal Section 14131.07 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 77 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By GROVE Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 77 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By GAINES Set #1 Question #2 (Y: 0 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 77 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By GAINES Set #1 Question #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By PEREZ, J (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 77 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By GAINES Set #1 Motion to Suspend the Rules By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB77 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 77 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By GAINES Set #1 Question #2 (Y: 0 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 77 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By GAINES Set #1 Question #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By PEREZ, J (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-14 - Assembly - SB 77 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By GAINES Set #1 Motion to Suspend the Rules By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB77 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 1983.) Ordered to third reading. Amendments by Assembly Member Beth Gaines tabled on motion by Assembly Member John A. PĂ©rez. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 2014.) Amendments by Assembly Member Grove tabled on motion by Assembly Member Atkins. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2016.) |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 893.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |