CA SB77 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2574, 2575, 8238, 8239, 8263.1, 8265, 8265.5, 8335, 8335.1, 8335.2, 8335.4, 8357, 8447, 10554, 17070.75, 41202, 41203.1, 41207.3, 41976, 42238, 42238.02, 42238.03, 44235, 47614.5, 48000, 49430.5, 51745.6, 52052, 52064.5, 52501.5, 52616, 53011, and 84830 of, to add Sections 41207.41, 60212, and 84920 to, to add Chapter 16.5 (commencing with Section 53070) to Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 84900) to Chapter 5 of Part 50 of Division 7 of Title 3 of, and to repeal Sections 8335.5, 8335.7, and 84908 of, the Education Code, to amend Sections 17581.6 and 17581.8 of, and to add Section 17581.9 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 33607.5 and 33607.7 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 11 of Chapter 325 of the Statutes of 2012, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: education omnibus trailer bill.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB77 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 378.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |