CA SB770 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-31 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-31 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1374.73 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 10144.51 and 10144.52 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: mental illness: developmental
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB770 Evans (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB770 Evans (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-31 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-25 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-08-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1122.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 741.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2863 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.52 | New Code | See Bill Text |