CA SB770 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 53.5 (commencing with Section 88750) to Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
California Community Colleges: pathways to law school programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB770 Roth et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1394.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1203.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 955.) (April 28). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 88750 | New Code | See Bill Text |