CA SB772 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 3031 of, and to add and repeal Section 3031.1 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to hunting.
Title
Junior hunting licenses: age of eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | May 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 658.) (April 11). |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |