CA SB786 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 84908.5 to the Education Code, relating to adult education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Adult education: Adult Education Block Grant Program: joint powers authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. David Hadley [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB786 Allen (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB786 Allen (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1023.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 84830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84907 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84908 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84908.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25722.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |