CA SB796 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1294, 44940.5, 44977, 44977.5, 44978, 44984, 45196, 45196.1, 87780, 87780.1, 87781, 87787, 88196, and 88196.1 of, and to repeal Sections 44983 and 87786 of, the Education Code, relating to school and community college employees.
Title
School and community college employees: absences due to illness or accident.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1294 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44940.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44977 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44977.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44978 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44983 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44984 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45196 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45196.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87780 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87780.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87781 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87786 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87787 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88196 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88196.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB796 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB796 |