CA SB802 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7108.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 3252 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 10262 and 10262.5 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 10261 of, and to add and repeal Section 7201 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to works of improvement.
Title
Works of improvement: progress payments: notice:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB802 Leno (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-09 - Assembly - SB 802 Leno Senate Third Reading By FUENTES (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-04 - Assembly - SB 802 Leno Senate Third Reading By FUENTES Amend By FUENTES Set #1 (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB802 Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-09 - Assembly - SB 802 Leno Senate Third Reading By FUENTES (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-04 - Assembly - SB 802 Leno Senate Third Reading By FUENTES Amend By FUENTES Set #1 (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB802 Leno (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Stricken from Senate file. | |
2009-10-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-10 | In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2388.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3189.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3037.) To third reading. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time and amended. Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 43. Noes 29. Page 3046.) Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 40. Noes 29. Page 3046.) To third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-07 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-30 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-05-21 | To Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-05-06 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 795.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 656.) | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 478.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |