CA SB811 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 269, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 269, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1107.5 of the Evidence Code, to amend Section 12838.6 of the Government Code, to amend Section 443.17 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 11350 and 11377 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 290.004, 1347.1, 1546.2, and 6044 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 827 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public safety: omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB811 PUB. S (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 811 PUB. S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB811 PUB. S (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 811 PUB. S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB811 PUB. S (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 269, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2353.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2770.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 15. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1107.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12838.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11350 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11377 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 443.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1347.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1546.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6044 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 633.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23575.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |