CA SB830 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 653w of the Penal Code, relating to intellectual property.
Title
Recording crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB830 Wright (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 830 Wright Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB830 Committee on G.O. (Florez) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 830 Wright Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SB830 Committee on G.O. (Florez) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-07 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4966.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-26 | Set for hearing August 26. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4955.) | |
2010-08-25 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6501.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-17 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6298.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.) | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Heard in committee on May 28.) | |
2010-03-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-09-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-08-20 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-07-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-18 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 931.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-14 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 682.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-03-26 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-03-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 19. | |
2009-03-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |