CA SB831 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 87207, 89506, 89513, 89515, 89516, and 89517 of, and to add Sections 87106 and 89515.5 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Assembly - SB 831 Hill Senate Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB831 Hill Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB831 Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB831 Hill Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB831 Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5018.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6755.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.) |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3783.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3703.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3233.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 82015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 87106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 87207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89512.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 89513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89514.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 89515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89515.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 89516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89517 | Amended Code | Citation Text |