CA SB836 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 104150 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to breast cancer screening, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Breast cancer screening: expanded coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-04-26 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-07 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3037.) | |
2010-03-11 | Set for hearing March 24. | |
2010-01-21 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-01-05 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 4. | |
2010-01-04 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |