CA SB836 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5008.9 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state beaches.
Title
State beaches: smoking ban.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB836 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 836 Glazer Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB836 Glazer et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 836 Glazer Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB836 Glazer et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 6026.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6771.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4344.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4298.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4366.) (March 13). |
2018-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5008.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |