CA SB838 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 889, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 889, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 204 and 2603 of the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Corporate records: articles of incorporation: blockchain technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB838 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 838 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB838 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 838 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB838 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 889, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6116.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6955.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5087.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4997.) (May 8). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4744.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 2603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 7132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 9132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12168.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12168.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |