CA SB846 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 432, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 432, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14201.2 to the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: Violent Crime Information Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB846 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 846 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - SB 846 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB846 Galgiani (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 846 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - SB 846 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB846 Galgiani (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 432, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4935.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6119.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6016.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5811.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3186.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3093.) (April 8). |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14201.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |