CA SB85 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2558.46, 8201, 8208, 8263.2, 8263.4, 8447, 8499, 42238.146, 56325, and 69432.7 of, to amend and renumber Section 60422.3 of, to amend and repeal Sections 56139 and 56331 of, to add Section 42251 to, and to repeal and add Section 42606 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 7911.1 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 7572, 7582, 7585, and 17581.5 of, to amend and repeal Sections 7572.5, 7572.55, 7576, 7576.2, 7576.3, 7576.5, 7586.5, 7586.6, and 7586.7 of, and to repeal Section 7588 of, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 5651 and 11323.2 of, to amend and repeal Sections 5701.3 and 5701.6 of, to add and repeal Section 18356.1 of, and to repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 18350) of Part 6 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB85 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - SB 85 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - SB 85 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2011-06-15 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 1436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-06-15 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 1948.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1949.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-02-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-02-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 168.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |