CA SB85 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2020 (Chapters 6 and 7 of the Statutes of 2020) by amending Items 0690-101-0001, 3540-001-0001, 3540-003-3228, 4700-490, 5180-101-0001, 5180-101-0890, 5180-111-0001, 5180-151-0001, 5180-151-0890, 6100-001-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-104-0890, 6100-112-0890, 6100-119-0890, 6100-125-0890, 6100-134-0890, 6100-161-0890, 6100-166-0890, 6100-194-0890, 6100-195-0890, 6100-197-0890, 6100-488, and 8570-101-0001 of, and adding Items 0509-112-0001, 0650-101-0001, 3125-001-0001, 3480-101-0001, 3540-101-0001, 3540-101-3228, 3600-005-0001, 3760-102-0001, 3790-003-0001, 3810-102-0001, 3825-102-0001, 3845-102-0001, 3855-101-0001, 6120-140-0001 and 8570-002-0001 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Assembly - SB 85 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 Skinner (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 Skinner (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-04-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 752.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 958.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 955.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 328.) |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 89.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 76.) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |