CA SB857 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 228, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 228, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 219 to the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Advisory task force: LGBTQ+ pupil needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB857 Laird et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 857 Laird Senate Third Reading By Zbur (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB857 Laird (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 857 Laird Senate Third Reading By Zbur (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB857 Laird (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 228, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2799.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3392.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 683.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 219 | New Code | See Bill Text |